TN HB2442 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 813
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits a state employer from inquiring about an applicant's criminal history on an initial application form for employment under certain circumstances; excludes certain state employers from this prohibition. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits a state employer from inquiring about an applicant's criminal history on an initial application form for employment under certain circumstances; excludes certain state employers from this prohibition. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 813
2016-03-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-14HouseComp. SB subst.
2016-03-10HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2016
2016-03-09HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2016
2016-03-08HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2016-03-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-02HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/8/2016
2016-03-01HouseAction def. in State Government Committee to 3/8/2016
2016-02-24HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/1/2016
2016-02-24HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2016-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/24/2016
2016-02-17HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/24/2016
2016-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/17/2016
2016-02-10HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/17/2016
2016-02-03HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/10/2016
2016-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2016-01-27HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2016-01-25HouseP1C.
2016-01-21HouseIntro.
2016-01-21HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2440 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 813

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback