TN SB2440 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 813
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits a state employer from inquiring about an applicant's criminal history on an initial application form for employment under certain circumstances; excludes certain state employers from this prohibition. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits a state employer from inquiring about an applicant's criminal history on an initial application form for employment under certain circumstances; excludes certain state employers from this prohibition. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26 Pub. Ch. 813
2016-04-26 Effective date(s) 04/14/2016
2016-04-14SenateSigned by Governor.
2016-04-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2016-04-04HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-03-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-03-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2016-03-23SenateConcurred, Ayes 24, Nays 1 (Amendment 1 - HA0732)
2016-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016
2016-03-21SenateSenate reset on Message Calendar for 3/23/2016
2016-03-17SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 3/21/2016
2016-03-14HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 64, Nays 24, PNV 0
2016-03-14HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0732)
2016-03-14HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2016-03-03HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2016-03-03SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-02SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2016-03-02SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 7
2016-03-02SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0560)
2016-03-02SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0559)
2016-02-29SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/2/2016
2016-02-23SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
2016-02-17SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/23/2016
2016-02-16SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/23/2016
2016-02-10SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/16/2016
2016-01-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2016-01-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2442 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 813

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback