TN HB2441 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires identification of a physician licensed in this state and a meeting with the enrollee's physician when a claim is denied on the basis of medical necessity. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, requires identification of a physician licensed in this state and a meeting with the enrollee's physician when a claim is denied on the basis of medical necessity. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2019 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee