TN HB2440 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a partial fill of a prescription of a controlled substance; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a partial fill of a prescription of a controlled substance; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Michael Curcio [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1007 | |
2018-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2025 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1007