TN SB2025 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1007
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a partial fill of a prescription of a controlled substance; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a partial fill of a prescription of a controlled substance; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 53 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1007 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/21/2018; 01/01/2019; 07/01/2019 | |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-25 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 80, Nays 0 PNV 0 (CC0025) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (CC0025) |
2018-04-25 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Terry, C. Sexton, Staples) |
2018-04-25 | House | H. Tabled conference committee report. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Haile, Kyle, Reeves) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee report tabled. (CC0036) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. (Terry, C. Sexton, Jernigan) |
2018-04-24 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 SB2025 |
2018-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Haile, Kyle, Reeves) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from its non-concurrence. (Amendment 1 - HA1085) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. 1 SB2025 |
2018-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in amendment (Amendment 1 - HA1085) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1085) |
2018-04-12 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0804) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2440 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1007