TN HB2434 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 5
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 5
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, declares a private entity to be not civilly liable in a class action resulting from a cybersecurity event unless the cybersecurity event was caused by willful, wanton, or gross negligence on the part of the private entity. - Amends TCA Title 29 and Title 47.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29 and Title 47, relative to civil liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 5 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0958) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-04-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 76, Nays 18, PNV 1 |
2024-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0981) |
2024-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2018 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.