TN HB2429 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires governmental bodies to provide notice of meetings to each member of the general assembly whose legislative district includes all or part of the county in which the meetings are held at least 14 days prior to the date of such meetings. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6 and Title 8, Chapter 44.
Title
As introduced, requires governmental bodies to provide notice of meetings to each member of the general assembly whose legislative district includes all or part of the county in which the meetings are held at least 14 days prior to the date of such meetings. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6 and Title 8, Chapter 44.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in State Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2514 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee