TN HB2427 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Failed in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-15 - Failed in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates the Ford Ice Centers in Davidson County as sports authority facilities for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, designates the Ford Ice Centers in Davidson County as sports authority facilities for purposes of consumption of alcoholic beverages on the premises. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Failed in Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-06-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2493 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee