TN HB2420 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates certain facilities in Jackson, Claiborne, and Grundy counties as premier type tourist resorts for purposes of on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As enacted, designates certain facilities in Jackson, Claiborne, and Grundy counties as premier type tourist resorts for purposes of on-premises consumption. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: 1,2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 69 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 860 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-19 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1,2 Ayes 69, Nays 16 PNV 6 HB2420 |
2018-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 2, PNV 1 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA1075) |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA1073) |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-10 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 70, Nays 16, PNV 8 |
2018-04-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/9/2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | P1C. |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro. |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2682 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 860