TN HB2394 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that examinations administered to applicants for a driver license or intermediate driver license must include the online or on-site viewing of a training video of at least one hour in length that covers, in substantially equal lengths of time, the topics of domestic violence, human trafficking, and driving under the influence; requires the department of safety to develop the training video and certificate of completion. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 50, relative to driver license examinations.
Sponsors
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2612 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee