TN HB2384 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, urges department of revenue, in consultation with department of tourist development, to study annual amounts of revenue from sales taxes and liquor-by-the-drink taxes generated over last five years from professional sporting events; requires department to submit its findings and recommendations within 90 days from conclusion of study to finance, ways and means committees of house of representatives and senate. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 11; Title 57 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, urges department of revenue, in consultation with department of tourist development, to study annual amounts of revenue from sales taxes and liquor-by-the-drink taxes generated over last five years from professional sporting events; requires department to submit its findings and recommendations within 90 days from conclusion of study to finance, ways and means committees of house of representatives and senate. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 11; Title 57 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-04-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-17HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-17HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1200)
2018-04-17HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1199)
2018-04-12HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018
2018-04-11HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018
2018-04-11HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018
2018-04-09HouseAction def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to Next Calendar
2018-04-04HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018
2018-04-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
2018-03-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/4/2018
2018-03-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018
2018-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/28/2018
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-02-05HouseP1C.
2018-02-01HouseFiled for intro.
2018-02-01HouseIntro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2380 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-19 - Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback