TN HB2380 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 914
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 914
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the posting of a bond or other guarantee for unfinished streets and other infrastructure projects in an approved subdivision plat before a building permit may be issued; requires that the approved subdivision plat be recorded in the county register of deeds before a building permit may be issued. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 3, Part 4 and Title 13, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, requires the posting of a bond or other guarantee for unfinished streets and other infrastructure projects in an approved subdivision plat before a building permit may be issued; requires that the approved subdivision plat be recorded in the county register of deeds before a building permit may be issued. - Amends TCA Title 13, Chapter 3, Part 4 and Title 13, Chapter 4, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Local Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-21 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 914 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Effective date(s) 05/13/2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2, Ayes 85, Nays 1 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | S. adopted am. #2 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0 |
2014-04-14 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1097) |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee 2 for 4/3/2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2014-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2014-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2014-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2014-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2108 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 914