TN HB2372 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that if, after determining the surrender to be in the child's best interest, the department of children's services accepts a surrender of a child who was previously placed for adoption by the department from the child's adoptive parent, the unrevoked surrender of such child may terminate the responsibilities of the adoptive parent for future child support or other future financial responsibilities. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1 and Title 37, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, specifies that if, after determining the surrender to be in the child's best interest, the department of children's services accepts a surrender of a child who was previously placed for adoption by the department from the child's adoptive parent, the unrevoked surrender of such child may terminate the responsibilities of the adoptive parent for future child support or other future financial responsibilities. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1 and Title 37, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-28 - House - FAMILY JUSTICE OF C&FA: Recommended for passage - refer to: Children and Family Affairs Committee (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 915 | |
2010-04-15 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2010-04-13 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2010 | |
2010-04-09 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2010-03-23 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 03/23/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 3/16/2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 3/9/2010 | |
2010-02-25 | Sponsor change. | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 03/02/2010 | |
2009-05-13 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 3/02/2010 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Family Justice of C&FA for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Action Def. in s/c Family Justice of C&FA to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Family Justice of C&FA for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Assigned to s/c Family Justice of C&FA | |
2009-03-04 | P2C, ref. to Children & Family Affairs | |
2009-03-02 | P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2341 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-28 - Pub. Ch. 915