TN HB2363 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 671
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 671
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "Ledford's Law," which requires the terms and conditions of parole for a prisoner convicted of vehicular homicide or aggravated vehicular homicide to specifically include that the prisoner, upon release, is prohibited from possessing or consuming alcohol or a controlled substance for which the prisoner does not have a valid prescription for the duration of any period of parole; makes related changes. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to crimes involving substance abuse.
Sponsors
Rep. Michele Carringer [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] |
Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 671 | |
2024-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-18 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1583 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024