TN HB2320 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes operation of off-highway vehicles on certain segments of state highways in Jackson County. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-185.
Title
As introduced, authorizes operation of off-highway vehicles on certain segments of state highways in Jackson County. - Amends TCA Section 55-8-185.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 6/4/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Infrastructure Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Infrastructure Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2903 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.