TN HB2316 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1005
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1005
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits males from participating in public higher education sports that are designated for females. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to participation in athletics.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Rep. Mark Cochran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1005 | |
2022-04-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/19/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration -- Civil Justice Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2153 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022