TN HB2285 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to summer study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to summer study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds community service as punishment for simple possession or casual exchange of certain controlled substances. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-418.
Title
As introduced, adds community service as punishment for simple possession or casual exchange of certain controlled substances. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-418.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to summer study | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/14/2012 | |
2012-01-12 | Assigned to s/c Judiciary Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3112 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-30 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2285&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB2285.pdf |