TN HB2272 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the state department of education to submit the U.S department of education's interpretations and directives on the implementation of department rules providing guidance to this state to the chairs of certain legislative committees; requires such information to be submitted to each member of the joint government operations rule review committee prior to each rule review meeting. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-04-22 | Pub. Ch. 722 | |
2024-04-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Motion to lift from the table adopted. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-03-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-11 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2024-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2024-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2106 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 722