TN HB2266 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 934
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 934
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner of human services, in consultation with various governmental and non-governmental entities that serve poor people, to conduct a study of poverty in Tennessee and submit a state anti-poverty plan to the governor and the general assembly by January 15, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, requires the commissioner of human services, in consultation with various governmental and non-governmental entities that serve poor people, to conduct a study of poverty in Tennessee and submit a state anti-poverty plan to the governor and the general assembly by January 15, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health Committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 3 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - House - HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health Committee (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 934 |
2014-04-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-15 | House | Motion to reconsider actions adopted. |
2014-04-15 | House | Motion to lift from table the motion to reconsider actions adopted. |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 80, Nays 8 |
2014-04-15 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA1040) |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-07 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-04 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2014-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2380 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 934