TN HB2250 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Def. to Summer Study in Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Def. to Summer Study in Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants who hold certain certifications and are working under the supervision of a licensed physician to complete a certificate of need for emergency diagnosis, evaluation, and treatment; removes requirement that only a physician may complete a second certificate of need in support of hospitalization when the first certificate was completed by a non-physician. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 6, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33, Chapter 6, Part 4, relative to individuals authorized to complete certificates of need.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Health Subcommittee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2137 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee