TN SB2137 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants who hold certain certifications and are working under the supervision of a licensed physician to complete a certificate of need for emergency diagnosis, evaluation, and treatment; removes requirement that only a physician may complete a second certificate of need in support of hospitalization when the first certificate was completed by a non-physician. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 6, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 33, Chapter 6, Part 4, relative to individuals authorized to complete certificates of need.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare Committee to next calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2250 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-08 - Def. to Summer Study in Health Subcommittee