TN HB2233 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the date by which TennCare must annually report to general assembly regarding pharmacy benefits under the medical assistance program from January 15 to February 1. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to coverage for prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Iris Rudder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2022-03-01 | House | Ref. to Insurance Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-02-17 | House | Sponsor change. |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2459 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee