TN HB2233 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the target amount to be maintained in the reserve for revenue fluctuations from 8 percent to 10 percent of the estimated state tax revenues to be allocated to the general fund and the education trust fund for each fiscal year. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-211.
Title
As introduced, changes the target amount to be maintained in the reserve for revenue fluctuations from 8 percent to 10 percent of the estimated state tax revenues to be allocated to the general fund and the education trust fund for each fiscal year. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-211.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2164 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2233&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB2233.pdf |