TN HB2229 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows, instead of requires, physicians who refuse to prescribe opiate medication to a patient to inform the patient there are physicians whose treatment of severe chronic intractable pain includes the use of opiates. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 11.
Title
As introduced, allows, instead of requires, physicians who refuse to prescribe opiate medication to a patient to inform the patient there are physicians whose treatment of severe chronic intractable pain includes the use of opiates. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 11.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Health Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Health Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2014-04-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-11 | House | Reset on Regular cal. for 4/14/14 |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/18/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2014-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2014-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1833 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-19 - Action Def. in S. H&W Comm. to 3/26/2014