TN HB2220 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-11)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 45-11)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires attending physician, chief medical officer, or medical examiner signing the medical certification of the cause of death of a military veteran to, prior to signing, review medical records, including records from the U.S. department of veterans affairs, if the deceased person is known to be a military veteran and if the physician, chief medical officer, or medical examiner is provided access to the records in order to determine if a service-connected disability was the principal or major contributory cause of death. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, Chapter 7, Part 1 and Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 5, relative to military veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 902 | |
2022-04-07 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2306 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/19/2022