TN HB2199 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 809
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 809
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes general sessions courts, by local rule, to allow papers to be filed, signed, or verified by electronic means that comply with technological standards promulgated by the supreme court; specifies that pleadings and other papers filed electronically under such local rules will be considered the same as written papers. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 15, Part 7.
Title
As enacted, authorizes general sessions courts, by local rule, to allow papers to be filed, signed, or verified by electronic means that comply with technological standards promulgated by the supreme court; specifies that pleadings and other papers filed electronically under such local rules will be considered the same as written papers. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 15, Part 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 809 | |
2018-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-26 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/26/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1789 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 809