TN HB2189 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that a law enforcement officer meeting certain qualifications who makes an arrest outside of the law enforcement officer's jurisdiction has the same legal status and immunity from suit as a state or local law enforcement officer making an arrest within the state or local law enforcement officer's jurisdiction if certain circumstances are met. - Amends TCA Section 38-3-113.
Title
As introduced, specifies that a law enforcement officer meeting certain qualifications who makes an arrest outside of the law enforcement officer's jurisdiction has the same legal status and immunity from suit as a state or local law enforcement officer making an arrest within the state or local law enforcement officer's jurisdiction if certain circumstances are met. - Amends TCA Section 38-3-113.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2891 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee