TN HB2168 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 921
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 921
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "State Parks Funding Act of 2022." - Amends TCA Section 11-3-120 and Title 11, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 11-3-120 and Title 11, Chapter 3, Part 3, relative to the State Parks Funding Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 921 | |
2022-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2022 |
2022-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2418 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/27/2022