TN HB2153 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, sets the salary of the county attorney at $65,000 annually, subject to cost-of-living increases. - Amends Chapter 289 of the Private Acts of 1976; as amended.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 289 of the Private Acts of 1976; as amended by Chapter 241 of the Private Acts of 1978; Chapter 92 of the Private Acts of 2000; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Scott County Attorney.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 44 | |
2024-03-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/5/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2325 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Pr. Ch. 44