TN HB2144 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Pub. Ch. 1083
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, excludes from the definition of marijuana, cannabis oil containing the substance cannabidiol, with less than 0.6 percent THC, including the necessary seeds and plants, when manufactured, processed, transferred, dispensed, or possessed by certain four-year institutions of higher education in this state as part of clinical research studies on the treatment of intractable seizures, cancer, or other diseases. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-402 and Chapter 936 of the Public Acts of 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, excludes from the definition of marijuana, cannabis oil containing the substance cannabidiol, with less than 0.6 percent THC, including the necessary seeds and plants, when manufactured, processed, transferred, dispensed, or possessed by certain four-year institutions of higher education in this state as part of clinical research studies on the treatment of intractable seizures, cancer, or other diseases. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-402 and Chapter 936 of the Public Acts of 2014.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 54 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 53 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 44 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-24 Pub. Ch. 1083
2016-05-24 Effective date(s) 05/20/2016
2016-05-20 Signed by Governor.
2016-05-09HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2016-05-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-05-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-04-22HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2016-04-21SenateConference Committee report adopted, 21 ayes 4 nays
2016-04-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-04-21HouseConf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 54, Nays 27 PNV 1
2016-04-21SenateConference Committee appointed. (Niceley, Southerland, Kyle)
2016-04-21HouseConf. comm. appointed ( H. Brooks, Faison, Fitzhugh)
2016-04-21HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/21/2016
2016-04-21SenateSenate refused to recede from amendment #1
2016-04-20SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/21/2016
2016-04-20HouseH. nonconcurred in S. am. no. SA1 HB2144
2016-04-20HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/20/2016
2016-04-19SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 3
2016-04-19SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0949)
2016-04-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2016-04-18SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2016-04-18HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2016-04-18HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-04-18HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 77, Nays 11, PNV 4
2016-04-18HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0928)
2016-04-13HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2016
2016-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2016
2016-04-06HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2016-03-30HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/6/2016
2016-03-22HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2016-03-16HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/22/2016
2016-03-15HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2016-03-09HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/15/2016
2016-03-08HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
2016-03-02HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/8/2016
2016-03-01HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/8/2016
2016-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/1/2016
2016-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
2016-01-27HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning-- Criminal Justice Committee
2016-01-25HouseP1C.
2016-01-21HouseIntro.
2016-01-21HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2125 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1083

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback