TN HB2138 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 782
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 782
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows the use of results from TCAP tests administered in the 2020-2021 school year in the TVAAS and to set the annual measurable objectives for schools and LEAs for the 2021-2022 school year; allows the use of annual measurable objectives using the results of those TCAP tests to assign letter grades to schools. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the use of results from TCAP tests administered in the 2020-2021 school year.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 782 | |
2022-03-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | No Action Taken |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2321 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022