TN HB2132 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the commissioner of revenue to require or authorize a "perfection period" for electronically filed Hall income tax and franchise and excise tax returns. - Amends TCA Section 67-2-107; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the commissioner of revenue to require or authorize a "perfection period" for electronically filed Hall income tax and franchise and excise tax returns. - Amends TCA Section 67-2-107; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1048 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 10/1/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-24 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1164) |
2018-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2051 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1048