TN SB2051 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the commissioner of revenue to require or authorize a "perfection period" for electronically filed Hall income tax and franchise and excise tax returns. - Amends TCA Section 67-2-107; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the commissioner of revenue to require or authorize a "perfection period" for electronically filed Hall income tax and franchise and excise tax returns. - Amends TCA Section 67-2-107; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1048 | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2132 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1048