TN HB2131 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-31 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes an outdated provision that required the department of labor and workforce development, on or before January 1, 2014, to report to the commerce and labor committee of the senate and the business and utilities committee of the house of representatives concerning the department's findings and recommendations concerning the Tennessee works pilot program. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 50, relative to employment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2143 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee