TN HB2131 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits a pharmacy technician to perform tasks delegated by the pharmacist, including participation in drug, dietary supplement and device selection, storage, distribution and administration, if the delegated tasks are consistent with the pharmacy technician's education, training, and experience. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63 and Title 68, relative to the practice of pharmacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Effective date(s) 04/08/2022 | |
2022-04-13 | Pub. Ch. 812 | |
2022-04-08 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2446 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 812