TN HB2124 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits fracturing in Tennessee, effective January 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 59; Title 60; Title 68 and Title 69.
Title
As introduced, prohibits fracturing in Tennessee, effective January 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 59; Title 60; Title 68 and Title 69.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2014-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee--Government Operations for review |
2014-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-27 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2064 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-12 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2124&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB2124.pdf |