TN HB2123 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the number of BEP funded full-time public school nurse positions from one for every 3,000 students to one for every 2,500 students. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 12.
Title
As introduced, increases the number of BEP funded full-time public school nurse positions from one for every 3,000 students to one for every 2,500 students. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-06-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-05-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2061 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee