TN HB2120 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, excludes recreational facilities, recreational purposes, and parks from the definition of "public use" as it applies to eminent domain. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 17, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 29, Chapter 17, Part 1, relative to eminent domain.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Elaine Davis [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Rep. Kevin Raper [R] | Rep. Jeff Burkhart [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] |
Rep. Mark Cochran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Sponsor change. |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1984 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 79, Nays 16, PNV 1