TN HB2109 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Healthy Food Financing Act." - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Healthy Food Financing Act." - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Public Health Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1619 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-25 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee