TN HB2068 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a private business who mandates routine COVID-19 testing for a specific category of individuals to require such testing for all employees, contractors with the private business, and such contractors' employees. - Amends TCA Title 14.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14, relative to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee to 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2786 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee