TN HB2054 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Def. to Summer Study in Employee Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Def. to Summer Study in Employee Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits revocation of parole, probation, or bail based on drug test result that is positive for THC below a certain level; prohibits public employers from taking adverse employment action and denying certain benefits based on such test result. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Section 49-6-4213; Title 49, Chapter 5; Title 50; Section 63-1-126 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, prohibits revocation of parole, probation, or bail based on drug test result that is positive for THC below a certain level; prohibits public employers from taking adverse employment action and denying certain benefits based on such test result. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Section 49-6-4213; Title 49, Chapter 5; Title 50; Section 63-1-126 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
Rep. Larry Miller [D] | Rep. Gloria Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee-- Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1944 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/24/2020