TN SB1944 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/24/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/24/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits revocation of parole, probation, or bail based on drug test result that is positive for THC below a certain level; prohibits public employers from taking adverse employment action and denying certain benefits based on such test result. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Section 49-6-4213; Title 49, Chapter 5; Title 50; Section 63-1-126 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, prohibits revocation of parole, probation, or bail based on drug test result that is positive for THC below a certain level; prohibits public employers from taking adverse employment action and denying certain benefits based on such test result. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Section 49-6-4213; Title 49, Chapter 5; Title 50; Section 63-1-126 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/24/2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2054 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-10 - Def. to Summer Study in Employee Affairs Subcommittee