TN HB2044 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds as a possible condition of probation that the court may impose participation in an alcohol and drug treatment program, if the defendant was charged with a drug offense, is pregnant or was pregnant at the time the offense was committed, and the defendant's use of alcohol or drugs was a contributing factor in the defendant's unlawful conduct. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Chapter 820 of the Public Acts of 2014.
Title
As introduced, adds as a possible condition of probation that the court may impose participation in an alcohol and drug treatment program, if the defendant was charged with a drug offense, is pregnant or was pregnant at the time the offense was committed, and the defendant's use of alcohol or drugs was a contributing factor in the defendant's unlawful conduct. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Chapter 820 of the Public Acts of 2014.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/9/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2276 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2044&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2044.pdf |