TN HB2037 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a person to have the right of suffrage restored if the person has entered into an agreement to pay the full amount of restitution owed to a victim in reasonable installments and is current on such installments. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Title
As introduced, allows a person to have the right of suffrage restored if the person has entered into an agreement to pay the full amount of restitution owed to a victim in reasonable installments and is current on such installments. - Amends TCA Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1903 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee