TN HB2035 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, preempts the entire field of legislation regarding extreme risk protection orders to the exclusion of all county, city, town, municipality, or metropolitan government law, ordinances, resolutions, enactments, or regulation; declares a federal statute, rule, executive order, or a federal judicial order that has the effect of enforcing an extreme risk protection order to be null and void; creates a Class A misdemeanor offense of attempting to enforce a federally implemented extreme risk protection order. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 38 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 38 and Title 39, relative to extreme risk protection orders.
Sponsors
Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Bryan Richey [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] |
Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Clay Doggett [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Brock Martin [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] |
Rep. Ed Butler [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Tandy Darby [R] | Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] |
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. Michael Hale [R] |
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. Gino Bulso [R] | Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Todd Warner [R] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Iris Rudder [R] |
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Michele Carringer [R] | Rep. Jeff Burkhart [R] |
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-04-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee - Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2763 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 24, PNV 0