TN HB2019 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 994
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 994
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines "industrial machinery" to exempt from sales and use tax machinery utilized in the design and manufacture of firearms equipped with integral devices that permit a user to program the firearm to operate only for specified person designated by the user through computerized locking devices or other means integral and permanently part of the firearm, when the machinery is utilized by a person whose principle business is fabricating or processing tangible personal property for resale. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As enacted, redefines "industrial machinery" to exempt from sales and use tax machinery utilized in the design and manufacture of firearms equipped with integral devices that permit a user to program the firearm to operate only for specified person designated by the user through computerized locking devices or other means integral and permanently part of the firearm, when the machinery is utilized by a person whose principle business is fabricating or processing tangible personal property for resale. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 994 |
2014-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to last calendar |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to next calendar |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2118 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 994