TN HB2013 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires statewide political party candidates to be nominated for elective public office by primary election rather than under the rules of the party or by primary election, with limited exceptions for certain offices. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 13, relative to political parties.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2414 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee