TN SB2414 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires statewide political party candidates to be nominated for elective public office by primary election rather than under the rules of the party or by primary election, with limited exceptions for certain offices. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 13, relative to political parties.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2013 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-06 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee