TN HB2013 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from December 31 to January 15 the date by which the transportation equity fund annual report, which includes tax revenues from fuels used for aviation, railways, and water carriers, must be submitted to the governor and members of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-207 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, extends from December 31 to January 15 the date by which the transportation equity fund annual report, which includes tax revenues from fuels used for aviation, railways, and water carriers, must be submitted to the governor and members of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Section 9-4-207 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1983 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee