TN HB2004 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a Class A misdemeanor of knowingly giving, loaning, or transferring a firearm to another that the person knows or reasonably should know is prohibited by state or federal law from possessing a firearm. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1896 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-27 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee